EP4234174 - LANYARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain CT 06053 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Mr. Norbert 65510 Hunstetten-Limbach / DE | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23170246.5 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | GB20200017142 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202017142 | GB20200018990 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: GB 202018990 | GB20210009571 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109571 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4234174 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4234174 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, A44B11/18, A45F5/02, A45F5/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP);
A45F5/021 (EP,US);
A45F5/00 (EP,US);
B23B45/003 (US);
B25F5/00 (US);
B25H3/00 (US);
A45F2005/006 (EP,US);
A45F2200/0575 (EP,US);
B25D17/20 (US);
B25D17/28 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | B25F5/02, A44B11/18, A45F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KORDEL | [2023/35] | English: | LANYARD | [2023/35] | French: | CORDON | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 20.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21204814.4 / EP4000812 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008054062 (GUNNING BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0063]; figures 1, 6 *; | [X]US9232850 (MOREAU DARRELL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 28; figures 1-9 *; | [X]EP3517254 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032]; figure 12 * |