EP4270109 - TONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGAWA, Hiroki Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
SANO, Tomohisa Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
HIRAMATSU, Tohru Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Kazuyuki Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
SHIBAHARA, Shohei Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 23170300.0 | 27.04.2023 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | JP20220075103 | 28.04.2022 Original published format: JP 2022075103 | JP20230027654 | 24.02.2023 Original published format: JP 2023027654 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270109 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/083, G03G9/097 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G03G9/0831 (EP);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (US);
G03G9/0835 (EP);
G03G9/0836 (EP);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONER | [2023/44] | English: | TONER | [2023/44] | French: | TONER | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002023413 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1,3,6,11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0026] , [0053] , [0057] , [0058] , [0062] , [0073] , [0082] , [0093] , [0111]; example 9 *; | [A]EP2853945 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0059] , [0061] , [0063] , [0064] , [0155] - [0158]; example 1 ** claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2015185644 (MATSUI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0125] , [0128] , [0132] , [0136] , [0138] *; | [Y]JP2016167029 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 1,3,6,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0011] , [0023] , [0028] , [0029] , [0030]; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US2018074421 (UCHINO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0076] , [0079]; claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2007176747 | JP2016167029 |