EP4230074 - SHOE COVER DISPENSER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTO Industry (WUHAN) Co., Ltd. KaiFa 2 Road TaiChang Road Economic Development Zone HanChuan, Hubei 431600 / CN | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Liang Jie HanChuan, 431600 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Tahtadjiev, Konstantin J.k. Goce Delchev bl.237, vh. B, et. 4, ap. 28 1404 Sofia / BG | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/34] | Tahtadjiev, Konstantin J.k. Goce Delchev bl.233, et. 8, ap. 35 1404 Sofia / BG | Application number, filing date | 23170888.4 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | CN20211003068 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110003068 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230074 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4230074 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/16, A43D999/00, B65H1/00, B65D83/08 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
A43B3/16 (EP);
A43B3/163 (CN,US);
A47G25/90 (US);
A43B3/106 (US);
A43D999/00 (EP);
A47G25/80 (CN);
B65D73/00 (US);
B65D83/08 (US);
B65D83/0894 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHUHÜBERZÜGE | [2023/34] | English: | SHOE COVER DISPENSER DEVICE | [2023/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR DE COUVRE-CHAUSSURE | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21215469.4 / EP4023093 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3009024 (OTO INDUSTRY WUHAN CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US2010288800 |