EP4279427 - PROCESSING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEEMANN GMBH Manfred-Wörner-Str. 160 73037 Göppingen / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Monika 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | 02 /
KAZMAIER, Benjamin 73277 Owen / DE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen Patentanwalt European Patent Attorney Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 23171207.6 | 03.05.2023 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | DE202210112640 | 19.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022112640 | [2023/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279427 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G41/00, B07B13/16, B07B1/00, B02C21/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B07B13/16 (EP);
B02C21/026 (CN,US);
B65G41/001 (US);
B02C2/04 (CN);
B02C23/12 (CN,US);
B07B1/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBEREITUNGSANLAGE | [2023/47] | English: | PROCESSING PLANT | [2023/47] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 16.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2722809 (MARAIS SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 4 - line 29 ** figure 5 *; | [XI]DE10305589 (BL PEGSON LTD [GB]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * [I] 2-9,11; | [A]EP3670760 (OZZIES PIPELINE PADDER INC [CA]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE102019126778 (KLEEMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011]; figures 2, 3, 4 * |