EP4276245 - METHOD OF APPLYING PHOTOLUMINESCENT MARKINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EternaLight s.r.o. Návsí 489 739 92 Návsí / CZ | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASZKA, Ladislav 739 92 Návsí / CZ | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Jonathan JECK, FLECK & Partner mbB Klingengasse 2 P.O.Box 14 69 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23171978.2 | 08.05.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | CZ20230000007 | 10.05.2022 Original published format: CZ 20230007 | [2023/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276245 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/518 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
E01F9/518 (EP,CZ);
E01C17/00 (CZ)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG VON PHOTOLUMINESZIERENDEN MARKIERUNGEN | [2023/46] | English: | METHOD OF APPLYING PHOTOLUMINESCENT MARKINGS | [2023/46] | French: | MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION DE MARQUEURS PHOTOLUMINESCENTS | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1461166 (BASF CORP [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [Y]US2012301657 (DIETRICHSSON STEIN [NO]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] - [0018] - [0024] *; | [Y]KR101485488B (HANDONG R & C CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0012] , [0049] - [0055] - [0066] - [0084] - [0109] , [0110] , [0114] *; | [Y]KR102205286B (CHOI A NA [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0008] , [0011] , [0012] , [0018] - [0024] - [0030] - [0034] - [0046] , [0049]; figures 1-4; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | PL41737B | PL173588B | US2006162620 | US2007022911 | PL402969 |