EP4257150 - Subcutaneous anti-her2 antibody formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adler, Michael 79540 Loerrach / DE | 02 /
Grauschopf, Ulla 4125 Riehen / CH | 03 /
Mahler, Hanns-Christian 79541 Loerrach / DE | 04 /
Stauch, Oliver Boris 89160 Dornstadt / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23172095.4 | 28.07.2010 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | EP20090167025 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: EP 09167025 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4257150 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4257150 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/19, A61K38/47, A61K39/395, A61K47/18, A61K47/20, A61K47/26, A61K47/42, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, C07K16/32 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (IL,US);
A61K9/08 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61K47/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/04 (EP,IL);
C07K16/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | A61K47/42 | Designated contracting states | DK [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | 27.10.2023 | RS | 27.10.2023 | Title | German: | Subkutane Anti-HER2-Antikörperformulierung | [2023/41] | English: | Subcutaneous anti-her2 antibody formulation | [2023/41] | French: | Formulation d'anticorps anti-her2 sous-cutané | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10737891.1 / EP2459167 | EP13166031.8 / EP2687202 | Divisional application(s) | EP23206430.3 / EP4339212 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6267958 (ANDYA JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2002035736 (ERICKSON SHARON [US], et al); | [A]WO2005023328 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al); | [A]US2006088523 (ANDYA JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2006104968 (BOOKBINDER LOUIS H [US], et al); | [A]US2007071675 (WU CHENGBIN [US], et al); | [A]WO2008150949 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | other | EP2459167 | EP2687202 |