EP4219086 - ROBOTIC SERVICE DEVICE AND HANDLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/26] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADIE, Robert HATFIELD, AL10 9UL / GB | 02 /
INGRAM-TEDD, Andrew Hatfield, AL10 9UL / GB | 03 /
WHELAN, Matthew HATFIELD, AL10 9UL / GB | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Ocado Group IP Department The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield AL10 9UL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23172552.4 | 28.02.2017 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | GB20160003520 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201603520 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4219086 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4219086 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B65G1/04 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B65G1/065 (GB,US);
B08B1/12 (US);
B08B3/02 (US);
B08B5/04 (US);
B60L53/00 (US);
B61B5/02 (US);
B61D15/00 (US);
B61F5/50 (US);
B61L23/04 (US);
B65G1/0414 (GB);
B65G1/0457 (GB);
B65G1/0464 (EP,GB,US);
B65G45/18 (US);
B65G45/22 (US);
B65G45/24 (US);
B66F9/06 (US);
B60L2200/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROBOTERSERVICEGERÄT UND HANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/31] | English: | ROBOTIC SERVICE DEVICE AND HANDLING METHOD | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERVICE ROBOTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE MANUTENTION | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 14.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17709608.8 / EP3423241 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012152877 (TADAYON SAIED [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1(a)-1(e),7 * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0107] ** paragraph [0121] *; | [AD]WO2015140216 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * page 6, line 13 - line 21 * * page 7, line 24 - line 26 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 20 - line 25 * * page 12, line 5 - line 9 * | by applicant | WO2015019055 | WO2015140216 | WO2015185628 |