EP4280366 - CAP ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR MAKING ITS CONNECTOR, AND BATTERY WITH THIS CAP ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Cordless GP 100 Innovation Way Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Kun Dongguan City / CN | 02 /
LIN, Guang Peng Dongguan City / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/47] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 23173250.4 | 12.05.2023 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | CN202210557033 | 20.05.2022 Original published format: CN202210557033 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280366 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/342, H01M50/195, H01M50/152, H01M50/186, H01M50/191, H01M50/193, H01M50/578 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H01M50/152 (EP,US);
H01M50/147 (CN);
H01M50/483 (US);
H01M10/04 (CN);
H01M50/186 (EP);
H01M50/191 (EP);
H01M50/193 (EP);
H01M50/195 (EP);
H01M50/30 (CN);
H01M50/3425 (EP,US);
H01M50/486 (US);
H01M50/578 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPPENANORDNUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG IHRES VERBINDERS UND BATTERIE MIT DIESER KAPPENANORDNUNG | [2023/47] | English: | CAP ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR MAKING ITS CONNECTOR, AND BATTERY WITH THIS CAP ASSEMBLY | [2023/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPUCHON, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SON CONNECTEUR ET BATTERIE AVEC CET ENSEMBLE CAPUCHON | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016099443 (LEE JE JUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; figure 2; claims 1-3 *; | [XI]US2018123163 (PARK PIL KYU [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11,15 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 60] - [0061] - [0 67] - [0091] - [ 117]; figures 2, 3A, 3B * [I] 5-8,12-14; | [A]US2018198108 (YOON U JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 15] , [0 85]; figures 1, 3, 5, 7 * |