EP4233663 - CLEANER NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Ingyu 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KWON, Hyeri 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sungjun 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jinho 08592 Seoul / KR | 05 /
RYOU, Kyoungho 08592 Seoul / KR | 06 /
RYU, Jungwan 08592 Seoul / KR | 07 /
SHIN, Jinhyouk 08592 Seoul / KR | 08 /
KIM, Youngsoo 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23173292.6 | 22.04.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | KR20180050085 | 30.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180050085 | KR20180050059 | 30.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180050059 | KR20180094341 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180094341 | [2023/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233663 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233663 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/20, A47L11/202, A47L11/40, A47L9/04, A47L9/06 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
A47L7/0009 (EP,CN,US);
A47L11/201 (CN,KR,US);
A47L9/0472 (EP,CN,US);
A47L11/2025 (CN,KR,US);
A47L11/206 (EP,CN,US);
A47L11/283 (CN,US);
A47L11/4038 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L11/4044 (KR,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L11/408 (CN,US);
A47L11/4083 (CN,US);
A47L11/4088 (EP,CN,US);
A47L11/4094 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L13/22 (US);
A47L9/0411 (CN,US);
A47L9/0686 (CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A47L9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGERDÜSE | [2023/35] | English: | CLEANER NOZZLE | [2023/35] | French: | BUSE D'ASPIRATEUR | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19796167.5 / EP3788931 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20050014652 (HAHN GYUNG HEE); | [A]KR101595727B (KIM JONG LAN [KR]) | by applicant | KR100405244B | KR20170028765 |