EP4235387 - USER INTERFACE FOR RECEIVING USER INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAMBETTI, Nicholas San Francisco, 94102 / US | 02 /
DASCOLA, Jonathan R. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 03 /
CHAUDHRI, Imran Cupertino, 95014 / US | 04 /
DAVYDOV, Anton M. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 05 /
IVE, Jonathan, P. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 06 /
LEMAY, Stephen, O. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 07 /
LYNCH, Kevin Cupertino, 95014 / US | 08 /
ORDING, Bas San Francisco, 94131 / US | 09 /
WAN, Wan Si Cupertino, 95014 / US | 10 /
YANG, Lawrence, Y. Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23173355.1 | 21.08.2015 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201462044923P | 02.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044923 P | US201562127800P | 03.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562127800 P | US201562129903P | 08.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562129903 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4235387 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4235387 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/451, G06F3/01, G06F3/023, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0483, G06F3/04883, G06F3/04886, G06F3/16, // G06Q10/107 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (DK);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/0236 (EP,US);
G06F3/0362 (EP,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP);
G06F9/453 (EP);
G06T13/80 (US);
H04L51/10 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04105 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (EP);
G06Q10/107 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | G06F3/04886 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE ZUM EMPFANGEN VON BENUTZEREINGABEN | [2023/35] | English: | USER INTERFACE FOR RECEIVING USER INPUT | [2023/35] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR LA RÉCEPTION D'UNE ENTRÉE D'UTILISATEUR | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 05.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15759998.6 / EP3189416 | EP20176616.9 / EP3719644 | EP22179347.4 / EP4089534 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2437148 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [I]US2013014019 (KIM SANG-HEON [KR], et al) | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | WO2013LT40072 | WO2013LT40061 | WO2013LT40056 | WO2013LT40054 | WO2013LT69489 | WO2013LT69486 | US19620108408 | US19640109039 | US19620609365 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080241839 | US20110987982 | WO2013US40087 | WO2013US40070 | WO2013US40067 | WO2013US40058 | WO2013US40108 | WO2013US40101 | WO2013US40098 | WO2013US40093 | WO2013US40053 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 | WO2013US69479 | WO2013US69472 |