EP4276278 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE ARTICLE WITH BRANCHED FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE III, Robert A. Meriden, 06450 / US | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23173368.4 | 15.05.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | US202217743521 | 13.05.2022 Original published format: US202217743521 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276278 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D9/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP);
F01D5/282 (US);
F01D11/005 (EP);
F01D11/02 (EP);
F01D5/147 (EP);
F01D5/20 (US);
F01D5/284 (US);
F01D9/042 (EP);
F05D2230/642 (EP);
F05D2240/80 (EP);
F05D2250/313 (EP);
F05D2250/314 (EP);
F05D2300/50212 (EP);
F05D2300/603 (EP);
F05D2300/6033 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTORARTIKEL MIT VERZWEIGTEM FLANSCH | [2023/46] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE ARTICLE WITH BRANCHED FLANGE | [2023/46] | French: | ARTICLE DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ AVEC BRIDE RAMIFIÉE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US10094239 (FREEMAN TED J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-15 * figures 2-4,6 * [A] 3,4,6; | [XA]US10563528 (FREEMAN TED J [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-15 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,6; | [X]US10724380 (GROVES II ROBERT CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,5,11,13* figures 1-4 * |