EP4287263 - LATERAL BIPOLAR TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Crolles 2 SAS 850 rue Jean Monnet 38920 Crolles / FR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALIER, Pascal 38530 CHAPAREILLAN / FR | 02 /
FREGONESE, Sebastien 33850 LEOGNAN / FR | 03 /
ZIMMER, Thomas 33400 TALENCE / FR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23173823.8 | 17.05.2023 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | FR20220005185 | 31.05.2022 Original published format: FR 2205185 | [2023/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287263 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/735, H01L21/331, H01L29/417, H01L29/08, H01L29/40, // H01L29/36 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H01L29/735 (EP,CN);
H01L29/1008 (CN,US);
H01L25/072 (CN);
H01L27/082 (CN);
H01L29/0603 (CN);
H01L29/0611 (CN);
H01L29/0684 (CN);
H01L29/0808 (CN,US);
H01L29/0817 (CN);
H01L29/0821 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/402 (EP);
H01L29/41708 (CN);
H01L29/42304 (CN);
H01L29/66242 (CN);
H01L29/6625 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/66272 (US);
H01L29/6631 (US);
H01L29/7302 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LATERALER BIPOLARTRANSISTOR | [2023/49] | English: | LATERAL BIPOLAR TRANSISTOR | [2023/49] | French: | TRANSISTOR BIPOLAIRE LATÉRAL | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11330083 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015097265 (LIN XIN [US], et al) [A] 1-22* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US9536788 (NING TAK H [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR3053834 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |