EP4283065 - FLOOR JOINT PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IAT Injektions- und Abdichtungstechnik GesmbH Badenerstrasse 54 2514 Traiskirchen / AT | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miftaraj, Basri 2500 Baden / AT | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 23174584.5 | 22.05.2023 | [2023/48] | Priority number, date | AT20220050371 | 25.05.2022 Original published format: AT 503712022 | [2023/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4283065 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/68 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/6804 (EP);
E04B1/6807 (AT);
E01C11/106 (AT);
E01D19/06 (AT);
E04B1/681 (EP);
E04B1/6813 (AT);
E04B1/6815 (EP,AT)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENFUGENPROFILE | [2023/48] | English: | FLOOR JOINT PROFILES | [2023/48] | French: | PROFILÉS DE JOINT DE SOL | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3606826 (BOWMAN THOMAS C) [X] 1-6,8 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 39 * [I] 9; | [XI]US4184298 (BALZER CLAUDE P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figures 1-6 *[I] 9; | [XA]DE3412515 (SCHULTE STEMMERK KG) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * figures 1-2 * [A] 11 |