EP4285893 - A COMBINATION COMPRISING EMPAGLIFLOZIN AND METFORMIN HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOVEL ILAC SANAYI VE TICARET A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilac Sanayi Yolu, No: 14 Istinye Istanbul 34460 / TR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GULER, Tolga Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ARMUT, Merve Istanbul / TR | 03 /
SUNEL, Fatih Istanbul / TR | 04 /
PEHLIVAN AKALIN, Nur Istanbul / TR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Genç Ilhan, Oznur Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza 33, Buyukdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 23174753.6 | 23.05.2023 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | TR20220008871 | 31.05.2022 Original published format: TR 202208871 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285893 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K47/12 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/2059 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATION MIT EMPAGLIFLOZIN UND METFORMINHYDROCHLORID | [2023/49] | English: | A COMBINATION COMPRISING EMPAGLIFLOZIN AND METFORMIN HYDROCHLORIDE | [2023/49] | French: | COMBINAISON COMPRENANT DE L'EMPAGLIFLOZINE ET DE L'HYDROCHLORURE DE METFORMINE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 06.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020058095 (GALENICUM HEALTH S L U [ES]) [A] 1-14 * claim 32 *; | [XI]WO2021123165 (KRKA D D NOVO MESTO [SI]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0082] * * example 9 * [I] 12; | [A]CN114404436 (BEIJING BAIOU PHARMACEUTICAL LTD RESPONSIBILITY COMPANY) [A] 1-14* example - * | by applicant | WO2011039337 | CN104586834 |