EP4282928 - METHOD OF PRODUCING DOUBLE-SIDED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET AND DOUBLE-SIDED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Shuhei Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
SAWAMURA, Amane Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 23174905.2 | 23.05.2023 | [2023/48] | Priority number, date | JP20220084264 | 24.05.2022 Original published format: JP 2022084264 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282928 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C09J7/38 (EP);
C09J7/40 (CN);
C09J7/385 (US);
C09J133/064 (CN);
C09J2301/124 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2301/302 (US);
C09J2301/50 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DOPPELSEITIGEN DRUCKEMPFINDLICHEN KLEBEFOLIE UND DOPPELSEITIGE DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE KLEBEFOLIE | [2023/48] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING DOUBLE-SIDED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET AND DOUBLE-SIDED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION DOUBLE FACE ET FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION DOUBLE FACE | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2177583 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0016] , [0092] *; | [X]EP2272930 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] , [0041] , [0045] *; | [XI]US2011070430 (SHIRAI MITSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 3-7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0093] , [0107] , [0113] , [0133] , [0141]; example 4 * [I] 1,2; | [XA]EP2345707 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 3-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0064] , [0070] , [0073]; examples 1,3 * [A] 1,2; | [X]US2016222255 (KOSO MASATSUGU [JP]) [X] 3,4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0118] ** paragraphs [0105] , [0111] , [0122]; example 1 * | by applicant | JP2021175796 |