EP4233809 - INTRAOCULAR PSEUDOPHAKIC CONTACT LENSES AND RELATED SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onpoint Vision, Inc. 6A Liberty Street Suite 100 Aliso Viejo CA 92656 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CADY, Kevin J. St Charles, 60175 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23175378.1 | 22.09.2015 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201462053771P | 22.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462053771 P | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 Original published format: US201514860629 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233809 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233809 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, // A61F9/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/1602 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/1648 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/0017 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/1694 (US);
A61F2002/1681 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/16902 (US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A61F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTRAOKULARE PSEUDOPHAKE KONTAKTLINSEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2023/35] | English: | INTRAOCULAR PSEUDOPHAKIC CONTACT LENSES AND RELATED SYSTEMS | [2023/35] | French: | LENTILLES DE CONTACT INTRAOCULAIRES PSEUDOPHAKIQUES AINSI QUE SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉES | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15845158.3 / EP3197396 | EP21161655.2 / EP3865092 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5133747 (FEASTER FRED T [US]); | [A]US2006142856 (WILLIS TIMOTHY R [US], et al); | [A]WO2008094518 (WERBLIN RES & DEV CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2013131796 (MIRLAY RAM SRIKANTH [IN]); | [A]US2013204364 (OLSON RANDALL J [US]) |