EP4235934 - LITHIUM ION BATTERY USING CROSSLINKABLE SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Xun Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | 02 /
Kuroki, Ryo Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | 03 /
Fukunaga, Yuki Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Hiromi Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | 05 /
Saito, Mitsuko Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23176156.0 | 11.10.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | JP20180192975 | 11.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018192975 | JP20180192978 | 11.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018192978 | JP20180206944 | 01.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018206944 | JP20190082084 | 23.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019082084 | JP20190141211 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019141211 | JP20190141513 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019141513 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4235934 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4235934 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/403, H01M50/449, H01M50/446, H01M50/417, C08J3/24, C08J9/36, H01G11/52, H01M10/052, H01M10/0566, H01M10/0585, H01M10/0587, C08J9/28, H01M10/04, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0568, H01M50/411, H01M50/406, H01M50/489, H01M50/491, H01M50/494 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0568 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/446 (US);
C08J3/24 (KR,US);
C08J9/28 (EP);
C08J9/36 (EP);
C08J9/365 (EP);
C08L23/06 (KR);
C08L23/26 (KR);
H01G11/52 (EP,KR);
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M10/0569 (KR);
H01M10/058 (CN);
H01M10/4235 (KR);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/406 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/491 (CN,US);
H01M50/494 (CN,US);
C08J2201/0502 (EP);
C08J2201/054 (EP);
C08J2323/06 (EP,KR);
C08J2323/26 (KR);
C08J2383/10 (EP);
C08J2423/06 (EP);
C08J2423/12 (EP);
C08J2423/30 (EP);
C08J2423/36 (EP);
C08J2483/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H01M50/406 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIE MIT VERNETZBAREM SEPARATOR | [2023/35] | English: | LITHIUM ION BATTERY USING CROSSLINKABLE SEPARATOR | [2023/35] | French: | BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-ION UTILISANT UN SÉPARATEUR RÉTICULABLE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19870116.1 / EP3866219 | EP22169052.2 / EP4064443 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JPH11172036 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [XA]KR20160129583 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XA]KR20160146134 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XA]KR20180033487 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | JPS3529854B | JPS3529858B | JPH10261435 | JPH11144700 | JPH11172036 | JP2000319441 | JP2001176484 | JP2007299612 | WO2010134585 | JP2011071128 | JP2014056843 | JP2016072150 | JP2017203145 |