EP4287563 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BRIGHTNESS MONITORING DEVICE OR AN INSTALLATION COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy Activites SA 50, avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSSEAU, Fabien 74300 CLUSES / FR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Novaimo Europa 1 362, avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23176212.1 | 30.05.2023 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | FR20220005160 | 30.05.2022 Original published format: FR 2205160 | [2023/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287563 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, E06B9/56, H04B10/116, E06B9/68 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H04L12/282 (EP);
E06B9/68 (EP);
H04B10/116 (EP);
E06B2009/6818 (EP);
H04L2012/2841 (EP);
H04L2012/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BETRIEBSSTEUERUNG EINER HELLIGKEITSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG ODER EINER ANLAGE MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2023/49] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BRIGHTNESS MONITORING DEVICE OR AN INSTALLATION COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE EN FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE LUMINOSITÉ OU D'UNE INSTALLATION COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 05.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011164304 (BROWN G Z [US], et al) [X] 1,8-12 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0068] *; | [XY]US2016258209 (BERMAN RACHEL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0135] * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2019028196 (RAINS JACK C [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract ** paragraph [0034] * |