EP4296815 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY FOR A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palmieri, Luigi 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Lange, Ralph 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 03 /
Van Duijkeren, Niels 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23176267.5 | 31.05.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | DE202210206291 | 23.06.2022 Original published format: DE102022206291 | [2023/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296815 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G05D1/0217 (EP);
G05D1/0223 (EP);
G05D1/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER TRAJEKTORIE FÜR EIN MOBILES GERÄT | [2023/52] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY FOR A MOBILE DEVICE | [2023/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE TRAJECTOIRE POUR UN APPAREIL MOBILE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006235610 (ARIYUR KARTIK B [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] *; | [XY]US2021402601 (WANG LIYANG [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] * [Y] 2-7,10; | [Y] - TAHA ELMOKADEM, "Advanced Algorithms of Collision Free Navigation and Flocking for Autonomous UAVs", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20211030), XP091084043 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * 3.3 Proposed Hybrid Navigation Statregy; * * 2.3 UAV Navigation Techniques * * 6.3 Sense and Avoid Control Strategy * |