EP4285886 - LIGHTWEIGHT CASKET HAVING ENHANCED BIODEGRADABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vandor Group, Inc. 4251 W. Industries Road Richmond, IN 47374 / US | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Justin F. Richmond, 47374 / US | 02 /
ELDER, Alan H. Richmond, 47374 / US | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23176787.2 | 01.06.2023 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | US202263348334P | 02.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263348334 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4285886 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4285886 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61G17/007, A61G17/04 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61G17/0073 (EP);
A61G17/032 (US);
A61G17/007 (US);
A61G17/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTGEWICHT-BEHÄLTER MIT ERHÖHTER BIOLOGISCHER ABBAUBARKEIT | [2023/49] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT CASKET HAVING ENHANCED BIODEGRADABILITY | [2023/49] | French: | CERCUEIL LÉGER À BIODÉGRADABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/36] | 30.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016367424 (KRINSKY LYNN [US]) [X] 1-7,14,15 * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 6, paragraph 63 * * figures 1-23 *[I] 8-10 | by applicant | US2023079701 |