EP4242390 - FLUSH TOILET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 24.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Masaki Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 02 /
YAMAKAWA, Satoshi Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 03 /
MIZOGUCHI, Kazuyoshi Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 04 /
KASHIRAJIMA, Shu Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 23177160.1 | 28.10.2015 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | JP20140231637 | 14.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014231637 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4242390 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4242390 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E03D11/08 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
E03D11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPÜLTOILETTE | [2023/37] | English: | FLUSH TOILET | [2023/37] | French: | CHASSE D'EAU | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15191970.1 / EP3020880 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1117089 (RATCLIFFE WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US1391477 (HINSDALE WINFIELD E, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US1529819 (FLEET OSCAR B VAN) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US1755040 (FRANK WALLACE) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2012026331 (LIXIL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US2013047328 (YAMASAKI YU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 2,3,5-7 *; | [A]CA2881752 (LIXIL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [A]CN104047351 (KOHLER CO) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP4941796B |