EP4243575 - CARTRIDGE FOR A LIQUID-COOLED PLASMA ARC TORCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hypertherm, Inc. Etna Road P.O. Box 5010 Hanover, NH 03755 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDERS, Nicholas, A Enfield, NH03748 / US | 02 /
SHIPULSKI, E., Michael Etna, NH03750 / US | 03 /
HOFFA, Michael Lebanon, NH03766 / US | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23177168.4 | 04.08.2016 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | US201562200913P | 04.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562200913 P | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4243575 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4243575 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H05H1/34 (EP,RU);
H05H1/3405 (CN,KR,US);
H05H1/28 (CN,KR,US);
B23K10/02 (CN);
B23K9/285 (CN,KR,US);
G06K19/07773 (CN,KR,US);
H05H1/3421 (KR,US);
H05H1/3423 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05H1/3457 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
G06K19/07773, H05H1/3468 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H05H1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTEN PLASMABOGENBRENNER | [2023/37] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR A LIQUID-COOLED PLASMA ARC TORCH | [2023/37] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR CHALUMEAU À ARC AU PLASMA REFROIDI PAR LIQUIDE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 23.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16751771.3 / EP3332616 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6515252 (GIROLD CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [I] 1-4,8-15 * abstract * * column 5, lines 20-36 *; | [XY]US6525292 (GIROLD CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [X] 1-4,8-15 * abstract * * column 4, lines 20-37 * * column 12, lines 43-63 * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]US2015181686 (SCHULZE CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 5-7* paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figure 16 * |