EP4233588 - AEROSOL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol, BS3 2LL / GB | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORD, Chris Liverpool L24 9HP / GB | 02 /
SUDLOW, Thomas Liverpool L24 9HP / GB | 03 /
ILLIDGE, Ben Liverpool L24 9HP / GB | 04 /
MADDEN, Alfred Liverpool L24 9HP / GB | 05 /
ASTBURY, Ben Liverpool L24 9HP / GB | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23177585.9 | 17.03.2020 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | EP20190164458 | 21.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19164458 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233588 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233588 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, // A24F40/10 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A24F40/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AEROSOLABGABESYSTEM | [2023/35] | English: | AEROSOL DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20715754.6 / EP3941281 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104382238 (SHENZHEN JIAPIN JIANYI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US2015136156 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2018197515 (NERUDIA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 24, line 28 - page 27, line 4; figures 5,6 * |