EP4309879 - METHODS FOR ALTERING PORTIONS OF SUBSTRATES WITH VIBRATION ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenser, Todd Douglas Cincinnati, 45202 / US | 02 /
Myers, Randall Allen Cincinnati, 45202 / US | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23177761.6 | 06.06.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | US202263350895P | 10.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263350895 P | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4309879 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B29C65/00, B32B37/06, B32B37/10, B32B38/06, // B29C65/10, B29L9/00, B29L31/48 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B29C65/086 (EP);
B29C65/70 (US);
A61F13/625 (EP);
B29C65/08 (US);
B29C65/087 (EP);
B29C66/0242 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/305 (EP);
B29C66/306 (EP);
B29C66/45 (EP);
B29C66/81425 (EP);
B29C66/81433 (EP);
B29C66/81812 (EP);
B29C66/83411 (EP);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP);
B29C66/91921 (EP);
B29C66/929 (EP);
B29C66/9512 (EP);
B29C66/9513 (EP);
B29C66/9516 (EP);
B29C66/9517 (EP);
B32B37/06 (EP);
B32B37/10 (EP);
B32B38/06 (EP);
B29C65/10 (EP);
B29C66/349 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/4878 (EP);
B29L2031/729 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG VON SUBSTRATTEILEN MIT VIBRATIONSENERGIE | [2024/04] | English: | METHODS FOR ALTERING PORTIONS OF SUBSTRATES WITH VIBRATION ENERGY | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR MODIFIER DES PARTIES DE SUBSTRATS AVEC UNE ÉNERGIE DE VIBRATION | [2024/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1112139 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [I] 1-4,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1; claims 1-7 * [A] 5-8,11,13; | [IA]US2003188819 (CAMPBELL STEPHEN MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0142]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5-8,11; | [A]US2016368201 (FISCHER THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0029] * |