EP4296950 - SYSTEM FOR INTRINSIC CALIBRATION OF CAMERAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TuSimple, Inc. 9191 Towne Centre Drive Suite 600 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NING, Juexiao San Diego, 92122 / US | 02 /
DENG, Fuheng San Diego, 92122 / US | 03 /
GONG, Chenghao San Diego, 92122 / US | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23178140.2 | 07.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | US202263355514P | 24.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263355514 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296950 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06T7/80 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP,US);
G06T7/74 (EP);
G06T2207/30208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR INTRINSISCHEN KALIBRIERUNG VON KAMERAS | [2023/52] | English: | SYSTEM FOR INTRINSIC CALIBRATION OF CAMERAS | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTALONNAGE INTRINSÈQUE DE CAMÉRAS | [2023/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2017287166 (CLAVEAU FABIEN [CA], et al) [I] 1,3-11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0016] , [0024] , [0036] , [0101] * [Y] 2,12; | [IY]US2019327454 (WALDL ANDREAS [AT]) [I] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 30] , [0031] , [0 47] * [Y] 2; | [A]US2021051317 (YAN ZHIZHONG [US], et al) [A] 9 * abstract ** paragraph [0003] *; | [IY]US11212511 (EL DOKOR TAREK [US], et al) [I] 1,14,15 * setion Minimizing Residual Error; column 6, line 20 - line 29 * [Y] 12; | [I]CN114049401 (SUZHOU DIGITAL HEALTH CARE MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [I] 1,14,15 * abstract * |