EP4292468 - BICYCLE STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemla, Jean Philippe 9 rue de Beauvais 95560 Montsoult / FR | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23178596.5 | 12.06.2023 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | FR20220005658 | 13.06.2022 Original published format: FR 2205658 | [2023/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292468 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/02, A45C11/00, B65D85/68, B65D25/28, B65D81/113 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A45C13/02 (EP);
A45C11/00 (EP);
B65D25/28 (EP);
B65D81/113 (EP);
A45C2013/026 (EP);
B65D2585/6862 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBEWAHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRRAD | [2023/51] | English: | BICYCLE STORAGE DEVICE | [2023/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RANGEMENT POUR VÉLO | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3929225 (LOCKE FRANK W, et al); | [A]US4353464 (BENTLER JAMES S); | [A]WO2019124516 (S WORKS LLC [JP], et al) |