EP4290757 - MAIN ENGINE START USING A DUAL PERMANENT MAGNET GENERATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Dhaval Schaumburg, IL, 60193 / US | 02 /
KOENIG, Andreas C. Rockford, IL, 61107 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23178793.8 | 12.06.2023 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | US202217837362 | 10.06.2022 Original published format: US202217837362 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290757 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/08 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H02P9/08 (EP);
F01D15/10 (US);
F02C7/268 (US);
F05D2220/768 (US);
F05D2260/85 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUPTMOTORSTART MIT EINEM DUALEN PERMANENTMAGNETGENERATORSYSTEM | [2023/50] | English: | MAIN ENGINE START USING A DUAL PERMANENT MAGNET GENERATOR SYSTEM | [2023/50] | French: | DÉMARRAGE DE MOTEUR PRINCIPAL À L'AIDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATEUR À DOUBLE AIMANT PERMANENT | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 11.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5512811 (LATOS THOMAS S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2012062161 (PATEL DHAVAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2012299515 (MARKUNAS ALBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * |