EP4276114 - CD20 BINDING SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIB VZW Suzanne Tassierstraat 1 9052 Gent / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/07] | For all designated states VIB VZW Suzanne Tassierstraat 1 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | |||
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states VIB VZW Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVERNIER, Jan 9860 Balegem / BE | 02 /
CAUWELS, Anje 9820 Merelbeke / BE | 03 /
VAN DER HEYDEN, José 9820 Munte / BE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23178961.1 | 07.03.2017 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | EP20160158962 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16158962 | EP20160166206 | 20.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16166206 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4276114 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4276114 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K39/395, A61K31/00, C07K14/715, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K39/001124 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
C07K14/56 (EP,US);
C07K14/7156 (US);
C07K16/3061 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/243, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/39] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINZELDOMÄNENANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CD20 | [2023/46] | English: | CD20 BINDING SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODIES | [2023/46] | French: | ANTICORPS À DOMAINE UNIQUE CIBLANT CD20 | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/39] | 21.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17709086.7 / EP3426278 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]WO2013107791 (VIB VZW [BE], et al); | [A]WO2014164680 (MOLECULAR TEMPLATES INC [US]); | [IDY]WO2015007520 (VIB VZW [BE], et al); | [AD]WO2015007903 (VIB VZW [BE], et al); | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US4537776 | EP0294703 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | WO9400491 | WO9404678 | US5354556 | US5475096 | WO9634103 | US5591767 | WO9710338 | US5639476 | US5674533 | US5733556 | US5831012 | WO9937681 | US6004746 | WO0190190 | WO0218422 | US6433157 | WO02085945 | WO03025020 | WO03035694 | US6653104 | US2004023334 | WO2004041862 | WO2004049794 | US2004132094 | WO2004060965 | US2004146938 | US2004157209 | US6794144 | US2004209243 | US6818418 | US6994982 | US7166697 | US7186524 | US7250297 | US7417130 | WO2008124086 | WO2010030671 | US2010119446 | US2010239633 | US7803907 | US7838629 | US7993636 | US2011262348 | US2012244112 | WO2013010779 | US2013058962 | WO2013107791 | WO2015007520 | WO2015007542 | WO2015007903 | WO2015007536 | US9067991 |