EP4241666 - MONITORING A NEUROMUSCULAR BLOCKADE STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RGB Medical Devices S.A. C. Alfonso Gómez 42 28037 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Fundació Eurecat Parc Tecnològic del Vallès Av. Universitat Autònoma N. 23 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès / ES | For all designated states Rodiera Olive, José Javier C. Teodora Lamadrid 52-60 4º 1ª Esc. F 08022 Barcelona / ES | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodiera Olivé, José Javier 08022 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
GONZÁLEZ MARTÍNEZ, Antonio 28037 Madrid / ES | 03 /
CORRAL HERRANZ, Francisco Javier 28037 Madrid / ES | 04 /
RUIZ NOLASCO, Ricardo 28037 Madrid / ES | 05 /
CARENAS ESPINOLA, Carlos 08302 Mataró / ES | 06 /
DE HARO MARMOLEJO, Carmen 08302 Mataró / ES | 07 /
RODRÍGUEZ GUTIÉRREZ, Rosa 08302 Mataró / ES | 08 /
CAMÍ CASALS, Antoni 08302 Mataró / ES | 09 /
CALZADILLA GISBERT, Francisco Javier 08302 Mataró / ES | 10 /
LACHARMOISE, Paul Dominique 08302 Mataró / ES | 11 /
COT CANTÓ, Marta 08302 Mataró / ES | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 23179045.2 | 22.12.2014 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | ES20130031489U | 24.12.2013 Original published format: ES 201331489 U | ES20140030202U | 13.02.2014 Original published format: ES 201430202 U | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4241666 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4241666 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022, A61B5/11, A61B5/389, A61B5/00, A61N1/04, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/4836 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/1106 (CN,US);
A61B5/02233 (EP,US);
A61B5/05 (US);
A61B5/1107 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP);
A61B5/395 (US);
A61B5/4519 (US);
A61B5/4821 (CN);
A61B5/4848 (EP,US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,US);
A61B5/6828 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (US);
A61B5/7203 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/0496 (EP,US);
A61N1/0556 (EP,US);
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/36014 (CN);
A61B2505/05 (US);
A61B2562/0219 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | A61B5/022, A61B5/11, A61B5/00, A61N1/04, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | ||
Former IPC [2023/37] | A61B5/022 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DES STATUS EINER NEUROMUSKULÄREN BLOCKADE | [2023/37] | English: | MONITORING A NEUROMUSCULAR BLOCKADE STATUS | [2023/37] | French: | SURVEILLANCE D'UN ÉTAT DE BLOCAGE NEUROMUSCULAIRE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14821182.4 / EP3086837 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5957860 (RODIERA OLIVE JOSE J [ES]) [AD] 1-15 * column 6, lines 28-67 * * figures 2-3 *; | [A]WO2007082382 (REHABTRONICS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 31 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2012053655 (BAIN DUNCAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0126] - [0130]; figures 8,9 *; | [A] - POLLARD B J, "Neuromuscular monitoring", CURRENT ANAESTHESIA AND CRITICAL CARE, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, LONDON, GB, (20041201), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.CACC.2005.01.003, ISSN 0953-7112, pages 383 - 391, XP004807650 [A] 1-15 * section "Stimulating nerves"; page 384 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cacc.2005.01.003 | by applicant | US5957860 |