EP4296795 - ARM WEARABLE DEVICE AND TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGI, Hiroki Tokyo, 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Masataka Tokyo, 205-8555 / JP | 03 /
UMEMOTO, Takayuki Tokyo, 205-8555 / JP | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23180142.4 | 19.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | JP20220102253 | 24.06.2022 Original published format: JP 2022102253 | JP20220138153 | 31.08.2022 Original published format: JP 2022138153 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296795 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/00, G04B37/14, G04G17/08 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G04B37/00 (EP);
G04B37/05 (US);
G04B37/14 (EP);
G04B45/0076 (US);
G04G17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AM ARM TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG UND UHR | [2023/52] | English: | ARM WEARABLE DEVICE AND TIMEPIECE | [2023/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE SUR BRAS ET PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1286120 (PIQUEREZ SA ERVIN [CH]) [X] 1,5,9 * the whole document *[A] 2-4,6-8; | [X]US2021141342 (AMANO MASAO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0057] * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JPS6335982U |