EP4297554 - HIGH TEMPERATURE SUPERCONDUCTING SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vision Electric Super Conductors GmbH Morlauterer Str. 21 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiser, Wolfgang 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23181079.7 | 22.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | LU20220502334 | 22.06.2022 Original published format: LU 502334 | [2023/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297554 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10N60/355 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H10N60/355 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATUR SUPRALEITENDER SCHALTER | [2023/52] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE SUPERCONDUCTING SWITCH | [2023/52] | French: | COMMUTATEUR SUPRACONDUCTEUR À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1275118 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 9-12 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 9; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US6344956 (MORITA MITSURU [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8,13 * column 7, line 53 - column 9, line 19; figures 8A-10 *[Y] 9-12; | [XY] - GAWITH J D D ET AL, "An HTS power switch using YBCO thin film controlled by AC magnetic field", SUPERCONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING, TECHNO HOUSE, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 32, no. 9, doi:10.1088/1361-6668/AB2D61, ISSN 0953-2048, (20190726), page 95007, (20190726), XP020342659 [X] 1,4-8,13 * page 3, column l, line 4 - page 4, column r, line 16; figures 3,4 * [Y] 9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1361-6668/ab2d61 | [XY] - BULMER JOHN S ET AL, "Switching Response of $\hbox{YBa}_{2}\hbox{Cu}_{3} \hbox{O}_{7 - \delta}$ to Simultaneous Application of Near-Critical Current, Field, and Temperature", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON APPLIED SUPERCONDUCTIVITY, IEEE, USA, vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TASC.2013.2292116, ISSN 1051-8223, (20140201), pages 1 - 9, (20131230), XP011536391 [X] 1,4-7,13 * page 2, column r, line 28 - page 5, column l, line 38; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASC.2013.2292116 | by applicant | - M P OOMEN et al., Supercond. Sci. Technol, (19990000), vol. 12, page 382 |