EP4299722 - METHOD FOR INDUCING ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELL AND USE THEREOF IN TREATING CANCER OR VIRUS INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fullhope Biomedical Co., Ltd. 10F., No. 10, Ln. 609, Sec. 5, Chongxin Rd. Sanchong Dist. New Taipei City 24159 / TW | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jan-Mou 24159 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
FANG, Chih-Hao 24159 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
CHENG, Ya-Fang 24159 New Taipei City / TW | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23181205.8 | 23.06.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | US202263354868P | 23.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263354868 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299722 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0783 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/464838 (US);
A61K39/0011 (CN);
A61K39/12 (EP,CN);
A61K39/4611 (US);
A61K39/464499 (US);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P35/00 (CN);
C12N5/0638 (EP);
A61K2039/5158 (CN);
C12N2500/84 (CN);
C12N2501/2302 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/2315 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/24 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/999 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG ANTIGENSPEZIFISCHER T-ZELLEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS ODER VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2024/01] | English: | METHOD FOR INDUCING ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELL AND USE THEREOF IN TREATING CANCER OR VIRUS INFECTION | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDUCTION DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES D'UN ANTIGÈNE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER OU D'UNE INFECTION VIRALE | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019183924 (SYZ CELL THERAPY CO [CN], et al) [A] 3-6 * claims 1, 22; description para [092], [200-201] *; | [XI] - DI SCALA MARIANNA ET AL, "Complementary Effects of Interleukin-15 and Alpha Interferon Induce Immunity in Hepatitis B Virus Transgenic Mice", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, US, vol. 90, no. 19, doi:10.1128/JVI.01030-16, ISSN 0022-538X, (20160912), pages 8563 - 8574, URL: https://journals.asm.org/doi/pdf/10.1128/JVI.01030-16, (20231110), XP093100245 [X] 1,2,9,13-15 * Description page 3 right column para 1; page 8 right column para 2; Figure 8 * [I] 3-8,10-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01030-16 | [A] - XU HAO ET AL, "Influence of various medium environment to in vitro human T cell culture", IN VITRO CELLULAR & DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY. ANIMAL., New York, vol. 54, no. 8, doi:10.1007/s11626-018-0273-3, ISSN 1071-2690, (20180712), pages 559 - 566, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/s11626-018-0273-3.pdf, (20231110), XP093102500 [A] 11 * page 2 right column para 3-4; pg 3 right column para 1, page 4 right column para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11626-018-0273-3 | [A] - EMANUELE CANESTRARI ET AL, "Human Platelet Lysate Media Supplement Supports Lentiviral Transduction and Expansion of Human T Lymphocytes While Maintaining Memory Phenotype", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, US, (20190904), vol. 2019, doi:10.1155/2019/3616120, ISSN 2314-8861, pages 1 - 11, XP055671229 [A] 12 * Introduction page 2 right column para 3; Results sections 3.2-3.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2019/3616120 |