EP4239538 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATED GENERATION OF ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT FINAL SETUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/36] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-GAL NGUYEN, Nitsan Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ZIMMER, Benjamin D. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Guruprasad Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CUNLIFFE, Alexandra R. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
STANKIEWICZ, Brian Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
COLLINS, Elisa J. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
MAIDEN MUELLER, David T. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
DEMLOW, Steven C. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
OLSON, Cody J. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
AFRIDI, Muhammad J. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
AMATO, Nancy Champaign, IL 61822 / US | 12 /
THOMAS, Shawna L. College Station, TX 77845 / US | 13 /
GUTIERREZ, Alexander Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | 14 /
SANGARI, Arash Frisco, TX 75033 / US | 15 /
GANDRUD, Jonathan D. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23181450.0 | 29.07.2019 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | US201862712383P | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862712383 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4239538 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4239538 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00, A61C9/00, G06N20/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G06N20/20 (EP);
A61C7/002 (EP,US);
A61C7/00 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G16H50/70 (US);
G06N20/10 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G09B23/283 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN ERZEUGUNG VON ENDEINSTELLUNGEN EINER KIEFERORTHOPÄDISCHEN BEHANDLUNG | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATED GENERATION OF ORTHODONTIC TREATMENT FINAL SETUPS | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION AUTOMATISÉE DE CONFIGURATIONS FINALES DE TRAITEMENT ORTHODONTIQUE | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19844870.6 / EP3829481 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018028294 (AZERNIKOV SERGEI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0157] * * figure - *[I] 3,8 | by applicant | US7605817 | US7956862 |