EP4236061 - COVERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 29.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SL Rack GmbH Münchener Str. 1 83527 Haag / DE | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schletter, Ludwig 83527 Haag i. OB / DE | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Lichtnecker, Markus Christoph Lichtnecker & Lichtnecker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Im Schloßpark Gern 2 84307 Eggenfelden / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23181546.5 | 20.12.2021 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | DE202110100081 | 05.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021100081 | [2023/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4236061 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4236061 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24S25/613, H02S20/23, H02S30/00, // E04D13/147 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
E04D13/1473 (EP);
F24S25/613 (EP);
H02S20/23 (EP);
H02S30/00 (EP);
E04D13/1476 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H02S30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/35] | English: | COVERING DEVICE | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUVERTURE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21216131.9 / EP4023959 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4333660 (CUPIT GEORGE M) [Y] 4-6 * figure 3a *; | [Y]GB2226832 (DOVETAIL BUILDING PROD [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2009129799 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE102011001692 (MONIER ROOFING COMPONENTS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3,11 *; | [A]US10312854 (DANIELS GREGORY S [US]) [A] 7-9* figure 2I * | by applicant | AT13559U |