EP4300335 - REMOVABLE TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORSKI, James P. Penfield, 14526 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23181593.7 | 27.06.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | US202217850113 | 27.06.2022 Original published format: US202217850113 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300335 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L67/141 (US);
H04L9/0877 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARES VERTRAUENSWÜRDIGES PLATTFORMMODUL | [2024/01] | English: | REMOVABLE TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULE | [2024/01] | French: | MODULE DE PLATE-FORME DE CONFIANCE AMOVIBLE | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008046898 (MOLINA JESUS [US], et al) [Y] 4,9,14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009292919 (ENGLAND PAUL [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045]; figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2010235648 (HOANG QUY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 3 * [Y] 4,9,14 [I] 3,5,8,10-13,15 |