EP4298954 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS CONTAINER WITH AN INTEGRATED DECORATIVE ACCESSORY AND CORRESPONDING DECORATED GLASS CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verescence France 49-51 Quai de Dion Bouton - Tour Aviso 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIZAN, Lionel 76260 EU / FR | 02 /
MARDESSON, Viridiana, Amalasonthe, Daphné 76260 EU / FR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Didier Martin, et al Les Terrasses des Bruyères - Bâtiment C 314 C, Allée des Noisetiers 69760 Limonest / FR | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23181805.5 | 27.06.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | FR20220006485 | 28.06.2022 Original published format: FR 2206485 | [2024/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298954 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/02, C03C17/28, C03C17/00, // A45D34/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C03C17/28 (EP);
A45D34/02 (EP);
C03C17/005 (EP);
A45D2034/007 (EP);
A45D2040/0012 (EP);
C03C2217/72 (EP);
C03C2218/31 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GLASBEHÄLTERS MIT INTEGRIERTEM DEKORZUBEHÖR UND ENTSPRECHENDER GLASDEKORBEHÄLTER | [2024/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS CONTAINER WITH AN INTEGRATED DECORATIVE ACCESSORY AND CORRESPONDING DECORATED GLASS CONTAINER | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT EN VERRE POURVU D'UN ACCESSOIRE DÉCORATIF INTÉGRÉ ET RÉCIPIENT DÉCORÉ EN VERRE CORRESPONDANT | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007023314 (HSU KUO-SUNG [TW]); | [A]DE202019004107U (GASTL CHRISTOPH PETER BENEDIKT [AE]); |