EP4300526 - VACUUM INTERRUPTER POLE AND ITS ASSOCIATED ELECTRICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Baoyi Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Dongliang Beijing, 102629 / CN | 03 /
WEN, Juan Beijing, 100036 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Jianbo Beijing, 100061 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Qi Beijing, 102629 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Ru Beijing, 100023 / CN | 07 /
BAJERSKI, Pawel 31-271 Kraków, Malopolskie / PL | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23182729.6 | 30.06.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | CN202210767562 | 30.06.2022 Original published format: CN202210767562 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300526 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/52, H01H33/02, H01H33/666, H01H33/66, H01H31/28, H01H33/12, H01H33/662 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H01H33/6661 (EP);
H01H33/664 (CN);
H01H33/122 (EP);
H01H33/6606 (EP);
H01H33/66207 (EP);
H01H33/666 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUMSCHALTERPOL UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/01] | English: | VACUUM INTERRUPTER POLE AND ITS ASSOCIATED ELECTRICAL DEVICE | [2024/01] | French: | PÔLE D'INTERRUPTEUR À VIDE ET SON DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 01.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]KR19980037833U (LG IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 1,4-15; | [Y]DE102009020152 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * figure 3 *; | [YA]CN106816341 (WENZHOU KAIYUAN GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 1,4-15 * Machine translation of CN106816341;; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3; | [Y]CN106952774 (ASIA ELECTRICAL POWER EQUIPMENT (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [Y] 1,4-15 * Machine translation of CN106952774;; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP3410455 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 * |