EP4318226 - INSTRUCTIONS TO CONVERT FROM FP8 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinecke, Alexander San Jose, 95134 / US | 02 /
Adelman, Menachem 7179034 Modi'in / IL | 03 /
Georganas, Evangelos San Jose, 95129 / US | 04 /
Gradstein, Amit 3052316 Binyamina / IL | 05 /
Hughes, Christopher Santa Clara, 95051 / US | 06 /
Mellempudi, Naveen 560035 Bangalore / IN | 07 /
Rubanovich, Simon 34792 Haifa / IL | 08 /
Sherman, Uri 25213 Bustan Hagalil / IL | 09 /
Sperber, Zeev 3092832 Zikhron Yaakov / IL | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23182982.1 | 03.07.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | IN202241044383 | 03.08.2022 Original published format: IN202241044383 | US202217958382 | 01.10.2022 Original published format: US202217958382 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318226 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G06F9/30025 (EP);
G06F9/30036 (EP);
G06F9/30038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFEHLE ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON FP8 | [2024/06] | English: | INSTRUCTIONS TO CONVERT FROM FP8 | [2024/06] | French: | INSTRUCTIONS À CONVERTIR À PARTIR DE FP8 | [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019042094 (NAIR KRISHNAKUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0147] , [0148] , [0159] , [0171] * [I] 2,4-6,9,11-13; | [A]US2019220278 (ADELMAN MENACHEM [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US10684854 (VALENTINE ROBERT [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |