EP4273536 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE DETECTION AND ANALYSIS OF FREE THIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ProteinSimple 3001 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCELROY, James San Jose, 95124 / US | 02 /
HEGER, Christopher Campbell, 95008 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23183319.5 | 23.08.2019 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | US201862722012P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862722012 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4273536 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4273536 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C40B30/04, G01N21/33, G01N21/64, G01N33/68, G01N33/58 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/6815 (EP,CN);
G01N21/33 (CN);
G01N21/6428 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/68 (CN);
G01N33/6854 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION UND ANALYSE VON FREIEM THIOL | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE DETECTION AND ANALYSIS OF FREE THIOL | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION ET D'ANALYSE DE THIOL LIBRE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19851480.4 / EP3841234 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5951981 (MARKLAND JR FRANCIS S [US], et al); |