EP4240109 - INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE, INDUCTION HEATING EQUIPMENT, INDUCTION HEATING METHOD, AND HEAT TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neturen Co., Ltd. 17-1, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATSU, Hitoshi Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Masato Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yoshimasa Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Tsutomu Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 05 /
KOYANAGI, Kenji Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 06 /
SAGAE, Masaki Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 07 /
ISHII, Tatsuya Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 08 /
MISAKA, Yoshitaka Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | 09 /
OGAWA, Yasuharu Tokyo 141-8639 / JP | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23183659.4 | 06.04.2012 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | JP20110085129 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011085129 | JP20110085130 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011085130 | JP20110085131 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011085131 | JP20110085132 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011085132 | JP20110122977 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011122977 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4240109 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4240109 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06, H05B6/10, H05B6/44, H05B6/40 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H05B6/101 (EP,CN,US);
H05B6/40 (US);
H05B6/04 (CN);
H05B6/06 (CN,US);
H05B6/44 (CN,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSHEIZVORRICHTUNG, INDUKTIONSHEIZAUSRÜSTUNG, INDUKTIONSHEIZVERFAHREN UND WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/36] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE, INDUCTION HEATING EQUIPMENT, INDUCTION HEATING METHOD, AND HEAT TREATMENT METHOD | [2023/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION, ÉQUIPEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12767740.9 / EP2696652 | EP16197529.7 / EP3145274 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63238212 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 12-16 * page 66 - page 67; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006290295 (YANG YUE [JP], et al) [A] 7-9* paragraphs [0068] , [0069] , [0078] , [79167]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2007012479 (HIGH FREQUENCY HEATTREAT) [A] 7-9 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0068] - [0081] - [0165] - [0170]; figures 1,25 *; | [X]US2008035633 (WEISS KUNO [DE], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraphs [0030] , [0055] - [0059]; claims 1-3 *; | [X]JP2008202099 (HIGH FREQUENCY HEATTREAT) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0022] - [0030] , [0033] - [0035] - [0050] - [0052] - [0057] - [0071]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2010243643 (CESANO MARIOLINO [IT], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0 40] - [0044]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JPS6342830B | JP2005325409 | JP2009287074 |