EP4253075 - N,N'-DIARYLUREA DERIVATIVE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND THERMOSENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanko Co., Ltd. 8-16, Tohri-machi Kurume-shi, Fukuoka 830-0018 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINISHI, Ryoichi Osaka, 567-0005 / JP | 02 /
ISHIBASHI, Yoshimi Osaka, 567-0005 / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23183770.9 | 10.08.2018 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | JP20170167444 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017167444 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4253075 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4253075 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/73, B41M5/333, B41M5/323, B41M5/327 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B41M5/3333 (EP);
C07C309/73 (EP,KR);
C07C309/76 (US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US);
B41M5/333 (KR);
C07C303/28 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | B41M5/327 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | N,N'-DIARYLHARNSTOFF-DERIVAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/40] | English: | N,N'-DIARYLUREA DERIVATIVE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND THERMOSENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL USING SAME | [2023/40] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE N,N'-DIARYLURÉE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET MATÉRIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT THERMOSENSIBLE L'UTILISANT | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18851961.5 / EP3677569 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0336086 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [A]WO9524900 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [Y]WO2017111032 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | by applicant | US3539375 | JPS5711088 | JPS60208286 | JP2002052842 | JP2002532441 | WO2014080615 | JP2017167444 |