EP4307149 - SYSTEM-ON-CHIP AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Bogyeong 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kihong 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
PARK, Junyoung 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jinsub 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 05 /
OH, Jaekeun 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 06 /
JANG, Youngjae 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23184330.1 | 07.07.2023 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | KR20220085279 | 11.07.2022 Original published format: KR 20220085279 | KR20220101593 | 12.08.2022 Original published format: KR 20220101593 | KR20220132723 | 14.10.2022 Original published format: KR 20220132723 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4307149 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4307149 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G06F11/10, G06F21/62, G06F21/64, G06F21/71, G06F21/76, G06F21/87 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G06F21/71 (EP);
G06F21/79 (US);
G06F11/10 (EP);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F21/606 (EP);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06F21/76 (EP);
G06F21/87 (EP);
H04L9/0819 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM-ON-CHIP UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/03] | English: | SYSTEM-ON-CHIP AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2024/03] | French: | SYSTÈME SUR PUCE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2868577 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]); | [YA]US2006233360 (GAMMEL BERNDT [DE], et al); | [YA]US2014020114 (BHATIA NEERAJ [US], et al); | [A]US2015312036 (KUMAR AMBUJ [US]); | [YA]US2019227784 (DE ATLEY DALLAS B [US], et al); | [A]US2020117814 (ITO KENICHI [JP], et al); | [YA]US2020293667 (KIM BUMHAN [KR], et al); |