EP4286396 - METHODS FOR IMPROVED PRODUCTION OF VITAMINS D2 AND D3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cibus Europe B.V. Ceresstraat 13 4811 CA Breda / NL | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Treiber, Laszlo San Diego, 92128 / US | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23184509.0 | 18.12.2015 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | US201462093904P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093904 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4286396 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4286396 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00, C07J9/00, C07J15/00, A23L33/155 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,US);
C07D401/00 (KR);
A23L33/155 (EP,US);
C07J15/005 (EP);
C07J9/00 (EP,US);
A23V2250/7104 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | C07J15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN PRODUKTION VON VITAMINEN D2 UND D3 | [2023/49] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVED PRODUCTION OF VITAMINS D2 AND D3 | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION AMÉLIORÉE DES VITAMINES D2 ET D3 | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 05.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15871215.8 / EP3233793 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4388242 (MALATESTA VINCENZO [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - ZHU G-D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF VITAMIN D (CALCIFEROL)", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19950901), vol. 95, no. 6, doi:10.1021/CR00038A007, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 1877 - 1952, XP000532390 [A] 1-13 * page 1882, column 2, middle - page 1883, column 2, middle * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00038a007 | by applicant | - TIANHOLICK, J. Biol. Chem., (19950000), vol. 270, pages 8706 - 11 | - KAUSHIK et al., Food Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 151, pages 225 - 30 | - CHARLES M. HANSEN, "Hydrogen Bonding Solubility Parameter", Hansen Solubility Parameters, ISBN 0-8493-7248-8 | - YATES et al., "Vitamin D: Molecular, Cellular and Clinical Endocrinology", Proceedings of the Seventh Workshop on Vitamin D, Rancho Mirage, California, USA, (19880400), pages 83 - 92 |