EP4318687 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL CELL IN A WEB PROCESSING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTIMA life science GmbH Steinbeisweg 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansen, Johannes 74545 Michelfeld / DE | 02 /
Dennert, Martin 56321 Brey / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23184617.1 | 11.07.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | DE202210207217 | 14.07.2022 Original published format: DE102022207217 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4318687 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0273, B32B37/00, H01M8/0286, H01M8/1004, // H01M8/10 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/0273 (EP);
H01M8/0286 (EP);
H01M8/1093 (US);
B32B2305/34 (EP);
B32B37/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEMBRAN-ELEKTRODEN-BAUGRUPPE FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE IN EINEM BAHNVERARBEITENDEN PROZESS | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR A FUEL CELL IN A WEB PROCESSING PROCESS | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODES POUR UNE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE DANS UN PROCESSUS DE TRAITEMENT DE BANDE | [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE102020206609 |