EP4246696 - BATTERY MODULE, ELECTRIC POWER UNIT, AND WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sueyoshi, Shunichiro Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Muraoka, Keisuke Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Nagatani, Shuji Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23185205.4 | 03.10.2019 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246696 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246696 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/6566, H01M10/613, H01M10/6235, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6562, H01M10/6563, H01M50/213, H01M50/24, H01M50/247, H01M50/367 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/367 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M10/6235 (EP);
H01M10/6563 (EP);
H01M10/6566 (EP);
H01M50/24 (EP);
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H01M50/367 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL, ELEKTRISCHE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT UND ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2023/38] | English: | BATTERY MODULE, ELECTRIC POWER UNIT, AND WORK MACHINE | [2023/38] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE, UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19928306.0 / EP3823082 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104137296 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2016018605 (MAKITA CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 47] - [0050] ** figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN106252550 (ZHEJIANG TOP POWER TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]KR20180054482 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0089] - [0092] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | JP3742261B |