EP4310349 - LOCKING BOLT SYSTEM WITH SEVERAL LOCKING BOLTS OPERATED BY BOWDEN CABLES AND A COMMON GRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICG GmbH & Co. KG Heubergstrasse 2 72172 Sulz am Neckar / DE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEINS, Marco 72184 Eutingen im Gäu / DE | 02 /
Haug, André 72160 Horb-Dettingen / DE | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23185220.3 | 13.07.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | DE202210207530 | 22.07.2022 Original published format: DE102022207530 | [2024/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310349 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/10, F16B19/02 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
F16C1/106 (EP);
B25B31/005 (EP);
F16B19/02 (EP);
F16B19/109 (EP);
F16C1/16 (EP);
F16B2/065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARRETIERBOLZENSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN, ÜBER BOWDENZÜGE BETÄTIGTEN ARRETIERBOLZEN UND GEMEINSAMEM GRIFFSTÜCK | [2024/04] | English: | LOCKING BOLT SYSTEM WITH SEVERAL LOCKING BOLTS OPERATED BY BOWDEN CABLES AND A COMMON GRIP | [2024/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BOULON DE VERROUILLAGE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE BOULONS DE VERROUILLAGE ACTIONNÉS PAR DES CÂBLES BOWDEN ET UNE POIGNÉE COMMUNE | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3831406 (GEBHARD H, et al); | [IDA]DE202020100562U (ICG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [IDA]DE202020104546U (ICG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | DE202020100562U | DE202020104546U |