EP4249513 - COMBINATIONS OF A HDM2-P53 INTERACTION INHIBITOR AND A BCL2 INHIBITOR AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERREIRO, Nelson 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
HALILOVIC, Ensar Cambridge, 02139 / US | 03 /
JULLION, Astrid 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
MEILLE, Christophe 4002 Basel / CH | 05 /
WANG, Youzhen Cambridge, 02139 / US | 06 /
FABRE, Claire 4002 Basel / CH | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Ridout, Joseph Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23185429.0 | 18.12.2019 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | US201862782727P | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862782727 P | US201862782730P | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862782730 P | US201862782735P | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862782735 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4249513 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4249513 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K31/635, A61K39/395, A61K31/706, A61K45/06, A61P35/02, C07K16/28 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/635 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/706 (EP);
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/635, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/706, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/39] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN | [2023/40] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF A HDM2-P53 INTERACTION INHIBITOR AND A BCL2 INHIBITOR AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER | [2023/39] | French: | COMBINAISONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2023/40] |
Former [2023/39] | KOMBINATIONEN AUS EINEM HDM2-P53-INTERAKTIONSINHIBITOR UND EINEM BCL2-INHIBITOR UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | ||
Former [2023/39] | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEUR D'INTERACTION HDM2-P53 ET D'INHIBITEUR DE BCL2 ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | Examination procedure | 16.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 13.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19835803.8 / EP3897647 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 13.07.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018158225 (SERVIER LAB [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 3 * * page 3, lines 8-11 * * page 15, lines 1-8 * * page 21, lines 17-22 * * claims 1, 4, 5, 7, 12, 13, 15 *; | [YD]WO2018178925 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [YD] 1-11 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 2, lines 15-34 * * page 6; table - * * page 9, lines 8-17 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 16 * * page 12; table 1 * * page 14, lines 11-13 * * page 24, lines 8-14 * * claims 1-4, 6, 9-11, 13, 16, 17 *; | [YD] - Naval Daver ET AL, "Preliminary Results from a Phase Ib Study Evaluating BCL-2 Inhibitor Venetoclax in Combination with MEK Inhibitor Cobimetinib or MDM2 Inhibitor Idasanutlin in Patients with Relapsed or Refractory (R/R) AML | Blood | American Society of Hematology", Blood; 616. ACUTE MYELOID LEUKEMIA: NOVEL THERAPY, EXCLUDING TRANSPLANTATION: NOVEL TARGETED AND IMMUNE-BASED APPROACHES IN THE TREATMENT OF AML, (20171207), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://ashpublications.org/blood/article/130/Supplement%201/813/83471/Preliminary-Results-from-a-Phase-Ib-Study, (20200310), XP055675134 [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V130.Suppl_1.813.813 | [Y] - CHRISTIAN LEHMANN ET AL, "Superior anti-tumor activity of the MDM2 antagonist idasanutlin and the Bcl-2 inhibitor venetoclax in p53 wild-type acute myeloid leukemia models", JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY & ONCOLOGY, (20161228), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13045-016-0280-3, XP055404210 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 10, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13045-016-0280-3 | [YD] - COURTNEY D DINARDO ET AL, "Safety and preliminary efficacy of venetoclax with decitabine or azacitidine in elderly patients with previously untreated acute myeloid leukaemia: a non-randomised, open-label, phase 1b study", THE LANCET ONCOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180201), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(18)30010-X, pages 216 - 228, XP055717753 [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 218; figure 1 * * page 224; table 4 * * page 225, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 226, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 227, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(18)30010-X | [YP] - WANG Y ET AL, "Targeting AML through apoptosis activation using Bcl2/ Mcl1 or Bcl2/ Hdm2 inhibitor combination Therapies", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20190701), Database accession no. EMB-628858608, XP002798256 [YP] 1-11 * abstract * | [P] - WANG Y ET AL, "Targeting AML through apoptosis activation using Bcl2/ Mcl1 or Bcl2/ Hdm2 inhibitor combination Therapies", CANCER RESEARCH 20190701 AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH INC. NLD, (20190701), vol. 79, no. 13, Supplement, ISSN 1538-7445 | [YP] - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT03940352 HDM201 in Combination With MBG453 or Venetoclax in Patients With Acute Myeloid Leukemia (AML) or High-risk M Syndrome (MDS)", ClinicalTrials.gov archive, (20191015), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/history/NCT03940352?V_4=View#StudyPageTop, (20200310), XP055675380 [YP] 1-11 * pages 1-2 * | by applicant | WO2013111105 | US2013245089 | WO2015117002 | WO2015198266 | WO2018092020 | WO2018178925 | - MILLARD M et al., Curr Pharm Design, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 536 - 559 | - BULLOCK ANFERSHT AR, Nat Rev Cancer, (20010000), vol. 1, pages 68 - 76 | - VOGELSTEIN B et al., Nature Education, (20100000), vol. 3, no. 9, page 6 | - ZHANG Y et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20100000), vol. 38, pages 6544 - 6554 | - VOGELSTEIN, B et al., Nature, (20000000), vol. 408, pages 307 - 310 | - ZHAO Y et al., BioDiscovery, (20130000), vol. 8, page 4 | - HOLZER P et al., AACR 2016, Abstract #4855, (20170000), vol. 71, no. 10, pages 716 - 721 | - HIGGINS B. et al., "Preclinical Optimisation of MDM2 Antagonist Scheduling for Cancer Treatment by Using a Model-Based Approach", Clin Cancer Research, (20140000), vol. 20, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-0460, pages 3742 - 3752, XP055205610 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-0460 | - DINARDO CDPRATZ KWLETAI A et al., "Safety and preliminary efficacy of venetoclax with decitabine or azacitidine in elderly patients with previously untreated acute myeloid leukaemia: a non-randomised, open-label, phase 1b study", Lancet Oncol, (20180000), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(18)30010-X, pages 216 - 228, XP055717753 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(18)30010-X | - LIN TLSTRICKLAND SAFIEDLER W et al., "Phase Ib/2 study of venetoclax with low-dose cytarabine in treatment-naive patients age >_ 65 with acute myelogenous leukemia", J Clin Oncol, (20160000), vol. 34, no. 15 | - CHESON BDBENNETT JMKOPECKY K et al., "Revised recommendations of the International Working Group (IWG) for diagnosis, standardization of response criteria, treatment outcomes, and re orting standards for therapeutic trials in acute myeloid leukemia", J Clin Oncol, (20030000), vol. 21, no. 24, pages 4642 - 9 | - CHESON BDGREENBERG PBENNETT J et al., "Clinical application and proposal for modification of the International Working Group (OWG) response criteria in myelodysplasia", Blood, (20060000), vol. 108, pages 419 - 425 |