EP4388852 - MOWER WITH CURTAIN ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPPELMAN, JACOB D 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
ROTOLE, DAVID V 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
PRONSCHINSKE, LOGAN T 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Stein, Stefan John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23185450.6 | 14.07.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | US202217818732 | 10.08.2022 Original published format: US202217818732 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4388852 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66, A01D34/86 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A01D34/828 (EP,US);
A01D34/661 (EP);
A01D34/863 (EP);
A01D75/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÄHER MIT VORHANGANORDNUNG | [2024/26] | English: | MOWER WITH CURTAIN ASSEMBLY | [2024/26] | French: | FAUCHEUSE AVEC ENSEMBLE RIDEAU | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5203150 (RYKEN JIM D [US], et al); | [A]EP0706750 (GREENLAND NIEUW VENNEP BV [NL]); | [A]US5727371 (KIEFFER FERNAND [FR], et al); | [A]US5761890 (LEHMAN BARRY E [US], et al); | [A]US5896733 (NEUERBURG HORST [FR], et al); | [A]JP6687971B ; | [A]EP3766327 (KVERNELAND GROUP KERTEMINDE AS [DK]) |