EP4336696 - DATA CENTER BALANCE OF PLANT INTEGRATED INTO FUEL CELL SYSTEM DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHHIBA, Priya Mountain View, 94043 / US | 02 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Hariharan Mountain View, 94043 / US | 03 /
SAKALKAR, Varun Mountain View, 94043 / US | 04 /
KOWALSKI, Thomas Mountain View, 94043 / US | 05 /
SANDHU, Angad Mountain View, 94043 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 23186175.8 | 18.07.2023 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | US202263401287P | 26.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263401287 P | US202318198896 | 18.05.2023 Original published format: US202318198896 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4336696 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP);
H01M8/04029 (US);
G06F1/189 (US);
G06F1/206 (US);
H01M8/04208 (US);
H01M8/1018 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP);
H05K7/2079 (US);
H01M2008/1095 (US);
H01M2250/10 (US);
H02J15/008 (EP);
H02J2300/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/43] |
Former [2024/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENZENTRUMSBALANCE EINER IN EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMDESIGN INTEGRIERTEN ANLAGE | [2024/11] | English: | DATA CENTER BALANCE OF PLANT INTEGRATED INTO FUEL CELL SYSTEM DESIGN | [2024/11] | French: | BALANCE DE CENTRE DE DONNÉES D'UNE INSTALLATION INTÉGRÉE DANS UNE CONCEPTION DE SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/43] | 13.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004265662 (BRIGNONE CYRIL [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0053] *; | [XI]US2013163192 (BALLANTINE ARNE [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9,13-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0127] * [I] 5,12; | [XI]US2018316030 (CADER TAHIR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 5,12; | [A] - GUIZZI GIUSEPPE LEO ET AL, "Fuel cell-based cogeneration system covering data centers' energy needs", ENERGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.energy.2011.07.030, ISSN 0360-5442, (20120501), pages 56 - 64, URL: https://art.torvergata.it/bitstream/2108/51234/13/EGY_2012_3707_accepted_manuscript.pdf, (20240122), XP093122015 [A] 1-15 * page 59 - page 62; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.energy.2011.07.030 | [A] - JONATHAN J DOGTEROM ET AL, "Powering Change with Fuel Cells in the Telecommunication Industry", TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2005. INTELEC '05. TWENTY-SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PI, (20050901), ISBN 978-3-8007-2905-0, pages 401 - 405, XP031063318 [A] 1-15 * page 402 - page 402 * |