EP4324661 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Tire Corporation 2-2-13, Fujinoki Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURA, Masaaki Hyogo, 664-0847 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23186480.2 | 19.07.2023 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | JP20220130016 | 17.08.2022 Original published format: JP 2022130016 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4324661 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4324661 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C11/16 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B60C11/1625 (EP);
B60C11/0306 (EP);
B60C11/0302 (EP);
B60C2011/0341 (EP);
B60C2011/0388 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2024/08] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2024/08] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2024/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2165859 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [XAI]EP2402178 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [XAI]WO2014118659 (PIRELLI [IT]); | [XAI]WO2017071842 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]EP3375644 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPH07449 | JP2021070449 |